McCraney v. Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marvin McCraney, Jr.
Defendant: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00087
Filed: June 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment shall issue. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/5/2017 (srd)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Plaintiff Marvin McCraney, Jr. has until on or before May 30, 2017, to respond to Motion for Summary Judgment 48 . If Movant wishes to file a rebuttal, it may do so on or before June 6, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/16/2017 (dtj)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 17, 2017. (js)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCraney v. Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin McCraney, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Fletcher Slover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Suzanne Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?