Myers v. Lamar County, MS et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie L. Myers
Defendant: Lamar County, MS, QCHC, Inc., Jason McNelly and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2016cv00198
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Lamar
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond to Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings 45 , 47 , and 50 on or before May 31, 2017. If Defendants want to reply, they must do so within seven days of the filing of Plaintiff's responses, but no later than June 7, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/17/2017 (dtj)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/7/2017 (dtj)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. Defendants shall respond to Motion to Amend 30 on or before April 18, 2017. If Plaintiff wants to reply she must do so within seven days of the filing of Defendant's response, but no later than April 25, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/5/2017 (dtj)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Plaintiff shall responod to Motion to Dismiss for a More Definite Statment 23 on or before March 21, 2017. If Defendant wants to reply, it must do so within seven days of the filing of Plaintiff's response, but no later than March 28, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/9/2017 (dtj)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Default Judgment; finding as moot 12 Motion for Hearing; granting 14 Motion to Set Aside Default Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/31/2017 (dtj)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant QCHC, Inc.'s Motion to Set Aside Default 14 on or before 1/26/17. Reply due no later than 2/2/17. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/18/2017 (dtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Lamar County, MS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie L. Myers
Represented By: Tangi A. Carter
Represented By: David Frank Myers
Represented By: Robin L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar County, MS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QCHC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason McNelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?