Caribbean Utilities Company, Ltd. v. Howard Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Caribbean Utilities Company, Ltd.
Defendant: Howard Industries, Inc. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2017cv00179
Filed: November 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER regarding continuation of Pretrial/Settlement Conference on December 4, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 11/15/2019 (dtj)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER denying 110 Motion to Exclude or Limit the Testimony of Defendant's Engineering Expert, Dr. Eric P. Guyer. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 11/12/2019. (lm)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER denying 108 Motion to Exclude Industry Standard and State of Mind Opinions. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 11/8/2019. (lm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caribbean Utilities Company, Ltd. v. Howard Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Frank W. Trapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caribbean Utilities Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Mariyette Meyers-Lopez - PHV
Represented By: Michael F. Myers
Represented By: Steven D. Turner - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?