Burroughs Diesel, Inc. v. Baker Petrolite, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Burroughs Diesel, Inc.
Defendant: Baker Petrolite, LLC, Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., Poly Processing Company, LLC and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv00026
Filed: February 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern (Hattiesburg) Office
County: Jones
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 261 Motion for Prejudgment Interest, Postjudgment Interest, and Costs; denying 262 Motion for Bill of Costs. The Court grants Plaintiff's request for postjudgment interest, but the Court denies Plaintiff's requests for prejudgment interest and costs. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/28/20. (cb)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER TO FEED JURY Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/11/2020 (dtj)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 191 Motion in Limine. The Court denies the motion as to the testimony of Caleb Worrell, but grants it in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/28/20. (cb)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and declining to address in part 221 Motion to Clarify and Reconsider. The Court grants the part as to Plaintiff's request to seek replacement cost as an alternative measure of damages, denies the moti on to the extent Plaintiff seeks admission of any previously excluded evidence, grants the motion to the extent Plaintiff seeks admission of evidence not previously excluded, and declines to address the motion with respect to any specific evidence not presently before the Court. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/25/20. (cb)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 137 Motion in Limine; denying 140 Motion to Exclude; finding as moot 142 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 174 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/22/19. (cb)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 11, 2018. (MMc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burroughs Diesel, Inc. v. Baker Petrolite, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burroughs Diesel, Inc.
Represented By: Ken R. Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Petrolite, LLC
Represented By: Spencer Mark Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Mark Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poly Processing Company, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Represented By: Nicholas K. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?