Moore v. City of Laurel Tax and Inspection Department et al

Plaintiff: Gary Moore
Defendant: City of Laurel Tax and Inspection Department and SKL Investment Inc. Edgewood LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00191
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 3, 2018. (js)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 19, 2018. (js)
November 16, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 : Style of case incorrect. Pro se litigant is directed to use "Eastern Division" instead of "Hattiesburg Division" in future filings. (CS)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Moore. (CS)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Laurel Tax and Inspection Department, SKL Investment Inc. Edgewood LLC, filed by Gary Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. City of Laurel Tax and Inspection Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Laurel Tax and Inspection Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKL Investment Inc. Edgewood LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?