QCC Investments, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: QCC Investments, LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv00195
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 2/27/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 18, 2019 (KPM)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Masley, Stephen)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 1/28/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 19, 2018 (KPM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Masley, Stephen)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 12/27/2018. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 26, 2018. (js)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Masley, Stephen)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Masley, Stephen)
November 20, 2018 Attorney advised this is the best copy of Exhibit A, being the same copy that was attached to the original Amended Complaint.(LDR)
November 20, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 : PDF pages [13, 39, 53, 57-59, 60] attached as Exhibit A to Amended Complaint are illegible. Attorney is advised to correct the error by refiling the Exhibit A.(LDR)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. from Chancery Court of Lamar County, Mississippi, case number 2018-CV-0319-DO. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3859693) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QCC Investments, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Stephen T. Masley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QCC Investments, LLC
Represented By: Seth M. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?