Backstrom v. Truvision Health, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Backstrom
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, Truvision Health, LLC and Terri Tew
Case Number: 2:2018cv00199
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to Martha F. Clark, Clerk, transmitting certified copies of the remand Memorandum Opinion and Order and docket sheet. (LDR)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss; granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. A certified copy of the Order and docket sheet mailed to Circuit Court of Perry County, Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/17/2019. (LDR)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Truvision Health, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declarations)(Gregory, Samuel)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Remand-Related Request for Admissions by Truvision Health, LLC (Gregory, Samuel)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Remand-Related Request for Production by Truvision Health, LLC (Gregory, Samuel)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Remand-Related Interrogatories by Truvision Health, LLC (Gregory, Samuel)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ashley Backstrom (Schmidt, George)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ashley Backstrom. The motion was filed without a memorandum of law as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(4). The plaintiff is ordered to file a memorandum of law in support of the motion on or before 12/12/18. Response to the motion shall be due on or before 12/26/18, and any reply shall be due on or before 1/2/19. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 12/10/18 (lm)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 10, 2018 (KPM)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ashley Backstrom (Schmidt, George)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Truvision Health, LLC. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 11/28/18 (lm)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Truvision Health, LLC (Gregory, Samuel)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by Truvision Health, LLC (Gregory, Samuel)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truvision Health, LLC (Gregory, Samuel)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lewis Champagne on behalf of Truvision Health, LLC (Champagne, Amy)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Truvision Health, LLC from Circuit Court of Perry County, Mississippi, case number 2018-0065 H. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3860428) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backstrom v. Truvision Health, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truvision Health, LLC
Represented By: Amy Lewis Champagne
Represented By: Samuel D. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Backstrom
Represented By: George W. Schmidt, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?