Crabtree et al v. Cotton et al
Plaintiff: Adriane Crabtree and Caleb Crabtree
Defendant: John Does 1-5, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Casey Cotton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00007
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Without Prejudice filed by Adriane Crabtree, Caleb Crabtree (McHard, Samuel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #24 MOTION to Dismiss State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Without Prejudice filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moore, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Without Prejudice filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Email to Counsel)(Moore, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt by Martin Hankins, Clerk, Circuit Court of Lamar County, MS, on 2/26/2019. (LDR)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of FRCP 41(a)(2) Motion to Dismiss. The attachment to the instant motion is deemed filed. No further written order shall issue. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 02/27/2019 (lm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in support of Plaintiff's' FRCP 41(a)(2) #24 Motion to Dismiss State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Adriane Crabtree, Caleb Crabtree (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Memo iso Motion)(McHard, Samuel)
February 25, 2019 Filing 27 Letter to Martin Hankins, Clerk, transmitting certified copy of #25 Order and docket sheet. (CS)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #24 MOTION to Dismiss State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Without Prejudice filed by Caleb Crabtree, Adriane Crabtree Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 02/25/2019 (lm)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, granting #20 Motion to Sever and Partially Remand. Plaintiffs' claims against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company are severed from the claims against Casey Cotton and the claims against Casey Cotton are hereby immediately remanded to the Circuit Court of Lamar County, Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 02/25/2019. (CS)
February 22, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Without Prejudice by Adriane Crabtree, Caleb Crabtree (McHard, Samuel)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Sever and Partially Remand MOTION to Remand filed by Adriane Crabtree, Caleb Crabtree (McHard, Samuel)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #20 MOTION to Sever and Partially Remand MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/22/2019 (lm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Partially Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moore, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Partially Remand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel)(Moore, Michael).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED ORDER, all causes of action solely against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Motion to Sever and Partially Remand #12 filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 02/20/2019. (CS)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, all causes of action solely against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Motion to Sever and Partially Remand #12 filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 02/20/2019. (CS)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company without Prejudice by Adriane Crabtree, Caleb Crabtree (McHard, Samuel)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the motion to sever and partially remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 11, 2019 (KPM)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #12 MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Partially Remand filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/11/2019. (lm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 Joinder in Document by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to #12 MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Partially Remand filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Farm Letter)(Moore, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Partially Remand filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Radicioni, Cory)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Partially Remand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Radicioni, Cory).
February 6, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 : Incorrect case number. Attorney is directed to correct the error in future filings by listing Case No.: 2:19-cv-7-KS-MTP. (CS)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Casey Cotton.(Herring, C.)
February 1, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 : Incorrect document attached. Attorney is directed to refile and attach the correct pdf document. (CS)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** ANSWER to Complaint by Casey Cotton.(Herring, C.) Modified on 2/1/2019 (CS).
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caleb Crabtree, Adriane Crabtree. Casey Cotton served on 1/6/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (McHard, Samuel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moore, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moore, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Banahan on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Banahan, John)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Moore, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Grafton E. Bragg on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Radicioni, Cory)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Radicioni, Cory)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Lamar County, Mississippi, case number 37:18CV119AM. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3893864) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B-Corporate Disclosure Statement) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabtree et al v. Cotton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriane Crabtree
Represented By: Samuel S. McHard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Crabtree
Represented By: Samuel S. McHard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael R. Moore
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Cory L. Radicioni
Represented By: Grafton E. Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Cotton
Represented By: C. Paige Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?