Holmes v. Day

Plaintiff: Paul H. Holmes and Bud
Defendant: Dennis Day
Case Number: 2:2019cv00038
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (CS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dennis Day (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Dennis Day, #2 Loan Sale and Purchase Agreement)(Glassman, Nathan)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dennis Day. Response due 7/17/19; reply due 7/24/19. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/5/19. (cb)
July 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. (LDR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dennis Day (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Dennis Day, #3 Exhibit Loan and Sale Purchase Agreement)(Glassman, Nathan)
June 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (LDR)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Response to Order re #3 ORDER and Notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 19, 2019 (KPM) filed by Paul H. Holmes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holmes, Mary)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and Notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 19, 2019 (KPM)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dennis Day. (CS)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dennis Day (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643006146), filed by Paul H. Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Loan Sale and Purchase Agreement) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul H. Holmes
Represented By: Mary Lee Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud
Represented By: Mary Lee Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Day
Represented By: Nathan Richard Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?