Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Wells et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A., Mississippi Department of Revenue, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Dorothy Wells, The United States of America, Roderick Wells, First Tower Loan, LLC and Mississippi Department of Employment Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00098
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Roderick Wells by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
August 30, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #24 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. (LDR)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer) Modified on 8/30/2019 (LDR).
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Dorothy Wells served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Stephenson, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Mississippi Department of Employment Security served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Rouse, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mississippi Department of Employment Security.(Marbury-State Gov, Abigail)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Roderick Wells. (CS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company as to Roderick Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Stephenson, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Mississippi Department of Employment Security, Dorothy Wells, Roderick Wells. (CS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Stovall on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Stovall, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Tower Loan, LLC (Tucker, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, National Association for Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A.. (Rouse, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate PHH Mortgage Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Rouse, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against First Tower Loan, LLC, Mississippi Department of Employment Security, Mississippi Department of Revenue, The United States of America, Dorothy Wells, Roderick Wells by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust and Assignment, #3 Exhibit C - Payoff, #4 Exhibit D - Payment History)(Rouse, John)
July 30, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12 : Answer and exhibit is filed as one main document. Exhibits should be scanned separately and docketed as properly identified attachments to the main document within the same docket entry. Attorney is directed to follow this procedure in future filings. L.U.Civ.R. 7.(b)(2). (LDR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by First Tower Loan, LLC.(Tucker, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael Necaise-State Gov on behalf of Mississippi Department of Revenue (Necaise-State Gov, Christopher)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. First Tower Loan, LLC served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Stephenson, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Stephenson, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Stephenson, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Mississippi Department of Employment Security served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Stephenson, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Mississippi Department of Revenue served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Stephenson, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. The United States of America served on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Stephenson, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Case-Federal Gov on behalf of The United States of America (Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : Incorrect PDF attached. It has been correctly refiled at Doc #3 . (LDR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to First Tower Loan, LLC, Mississippi Department of Employment Security, Mississippi Department of Revenue, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, The United States of America, Dorothy Wells, Roderick Wells, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A.. (LDR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** Summons Issued as to First Tower Loan, LLC, Mississippi Department of Employment Security, Mississippi Department of Revenue, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, The United States of America, Dorothy Wells, Roderick Wells, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Summons First Tower Loan, #2 Summons MS Dept of Employment Security, #3 Summons MS Dept. of Revenue, #4 Summons Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, #5 Summons Roderick Wells, #6 Summons United States of America, #7 Summons Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota N.A.)(LDR) Modified on 7/3/2019 (LDR).
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Tower Loan, LLC, Mississippi Department of Employment Security, Mississippi Department of Revenue, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, The United States of America, Dorothy Wells, Roderick Wells, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4029075), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Allstate Certified Policy)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Wells et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A.
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Revenue
Represented By: Christopher Michael Necaise-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Case-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Tower Loan, LLC
Represented By: John E. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Employment Security
Represented By: Abigail M Marbury-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert R. Stephenson
Represented By: David E. Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?