Davis v. S.M.C.I. et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Davis
Defendant: Joe Errington and S.M.C.I.
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv00101
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, on or before September 20, 2019, Petitioner shall file an amended petition consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 8/30/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 8/30/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, on or before August 16, 2019, Petitioner shall complete and file the attached application OR pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 07/17/2019. [Copy of Order and application mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jimmy Davis. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. S.M.C.I. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Errington
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.M.C.I.
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?