Morrow v. Life of the South Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Wilky D. Morrow
Defendant: Life of the South Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00105
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Life of the South Insurance Company Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/16/2019 (lm)
August 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Exhibit not properly identified. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (LDR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Life of the South Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Butler, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's answer is due by 8/14/19. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 31, 2019 (KPM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life of the South Insurance Company (Butler, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before 7/31/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 16, 2019. (js)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life of the South Insurance Company (Butler, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life of the South Insurance Company (Butler, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Life of the South Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Mississippi, case number 39CI1:19-00123-AM. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4032758) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Life of the South Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life of the South Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Julian Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilky D. Morrow
Represented By: John G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?