Kelly v. Contract Callers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vickie Kelly
Defendant: Contract Callers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00110
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Woods, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Woods, Edwin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2019 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/25/19. (KPM)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Contract Callers, Inc..(Culp, H.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Contract Callers, Inc. (CS)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps are hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on August 8, 2019 (KPM)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4055193) by Vickie Kelly (Botes, Bradford)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4055191) by Vickie Kelly (Botes, Bradford)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Contract Callers, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4054804), filed by Vickie Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Registered Agent) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Contract Callers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Kelly
Represented By: Bradford W. Botes
Represented By: David J. Philipps - PHV
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps - PHV
Represented By: Edwin Woods, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contract Callers, Inc.
Represented By: H. Richmond Culp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?