Estate of George T. Hammond v. J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Estate of George T. Hammond
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. and John Does 1-9
Case Number: 2:2019cv00114
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/9/19. (cb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Estate of George T. Hammond (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Surreply)(Medley, Donald)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 MOTION to Remand filed by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Seanor, Christina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 2019 Account Statement for Hammond)(Seanor, Christina)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Seanor, Christina)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 27, 2019 (KPM)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Estate of George T. Hammond. Response due 10/8/19; reply due 10/15/19. No further order will issue. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/25/19. (cb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Estate of George T. Hammond (Medley, Donald)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Estate of George T. Hammond (Medley, Donald)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Estate of George T. Hammond (Medley, Donald)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Estate of George T. Hammond (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chancery Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - composite of letters to defendant)(Medley, Donald)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file a response to the pending motion to dismiss. The response is due on or before September 24, 2019. Due to the length of this extension, it is very unlikely the Court will grant Plaintiff any further extensions on this deadline. No further order will issue. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/30/19. (cb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order, #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Estate of George T. Hammond (Medley, Donald)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Clay W. Morgan on behalf of J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Morgan, Mary)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. Response due 9/3/19; reply due 9/10/19. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/20/19. (cb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Seanor, Christina)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of DOT to JP Morgan, #3 Exhibit C - Assignment of DOT to Carrington, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment of DOT, Carrington to JPMorgan, #5 Exhibit E - Substitution of Trustee, #6 Exhibit F - Decree appointing administrator, #7 Exhibit G - Substituted Trustee Deed 2019)(Seanor, Christina)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. from Chancery Court of Forrest County, Mississippi, case number 19-cv-00386-CS. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4057851) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Documents) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of George T. Hammond v. J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of George T. Hammond
Represented By: Donald W. Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: Christina M. Seanor
Represented By: Mary Clay W. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?