Martin v. Big R Trucking et al
Plaintiff: Lon Martin
Defendant: Big R Trucking and Jason Nations
Case Number: 2:2019cv00119
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2019 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 11/1/19. (KPM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Big R Trucking, Jason Nations.(Huffman, Nicole)
September 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : Style of case is incorrect. The order of the defendants should appear in the same order as listed on the original complaint. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to Incorrect Division listed. Attorney is advised to use the division name "Eastern Division" in future filings. (LDR)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 First NOTICE of Service of Initial and Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Lon Martin (Ward, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Jason Nations answer due 9/28/2019. (LDR)
September 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : This entry should be disregarded, it has been refiled as Doc #3. DOCKET ANNOTATION as #3 : This docket entry fails to select each defendant individually. Selecting individual defendants will allow the assignment of the appropriate answer deadline for each defendant based on the date of service. Attorney is advised to select each defendant individually in future filing. (LDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward" as to Docket Annotation. Mail sent to Charles Raymond Ward, Jr. (LDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lon Martin. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Ward, Charles)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lon Martin on defendants (Ward, Charles) Modified on 9/11/2019 (LDR).
August 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 : Division name incorrect. Attorney is directed to use "Eastern Division" in future filings. (CS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big R Trucking, Jason Nations (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4057121), filed by Lon Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Big R Trucking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lon Martin
Represented By: Charles Raymond Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big R Trucking
Represented By: Nicole C. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Nations
Represented By: Nicole C. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?