Herrington v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn K. Herrington
Defendant: John Does 1-5 and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00121
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Disclosure by Evelyn K. Herrington (McCumber, Harry)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2019 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/25/19. (KPM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Evelyn K. Herrington (McCumber, Harry)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, LP for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (DeLashmet, W.)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (DeLashmet, W.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Forrest General, #2 Exhibit B Southern Bone and Joint, #3 Exhibit C Comprehensive Radiology, #4 Exhibit D LabCorp, #5 Exhibit E Dr. Velez, #6 Exhibit F South Central Orthopedics, #7 Exhibit G South Central Regional Medical Center, #8 Exhibit H South Central Speech and Rehab, #9 Exhibit I Genesis Physical Therapy Group, #10 Exhibit J Jefferson Neurology Clinic, #11 Exhibit K Hattiesburg Clinic, #12 Exhibit L Laurel Family Clinic, #13 Exhibit M Jackson Neurosurgery Clinic, #14 Exhibit N Women's Pavilion, #15 Exhibit O Laurel Pain Clinic)(DeLashmet, W.)
September 4, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : When filing the notice of intent to serve on a party(s), the attorney shall attach a copy of the completed subpoena as an exhibit to the notice for all party(s) concerned. Any PDF fillable on-line forms once completed should be electronically converted to PDF by printing to the PDF printer. Save the file with an appropriate name in a folder. E-file the electronically converted PDF form, not the form which was filled in and saved. Attorney is directed to refile. (CS)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 First NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Evelyn K. Herrington (McCumber, Harry)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 First NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Evelyn K. Herrington (McCumber, Harry)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Forrest General, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Southern Bone and Joint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Comprehensive Radiology, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D LabCorp, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Dr. Juan Velez, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F South Central Ortho, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G South Central Regional Medical Center, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H South Central Speech and Rehab, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I Genesis Physical Therapy Group, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J Jefferson Neurology Clinic, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K Hattiesburg Clinic, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L Laurel Family Clinic, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M Jackson Neurosurgery, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N Womens Pavilion, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O Laurel Pain Clinic)(DeLashmet, W.) Modified on 9/4/2019 (CS).
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (DeLashmet, W.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Circuit Court of Jones County, Mississippi, case number 19-00027-cv4. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-406597) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Wal-Mart's Requests for Admissions and Second Requests for Production to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit C-Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant, Walmart Stores East LP's Request for Admissions and Second Requests for Production) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrington v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn K. Herrington
Represented By: Harry Merritt McCumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?