Hicks v. Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Plaintiff: Jamye L. Hicks
Defendant: Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00138
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's #3 Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/8/2019. (LDR)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 Response to Motion filed by Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Lee, Preston)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jamye L. Hicks (Abernathy, Lawrence)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC. Response due 10/3/19; reply due 10/10/19. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/23/19. (cb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Lee, Preston)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(Lee, Preston)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Lee, Preston)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Lee, Preston)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefan G. Bourn on behalf of Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Bourn, Stefan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC from County Court of Jones County, Mississippi, case number 2019-060-CV8. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4088167) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Certified State Court Record, #5 Exhibit D - Mississippi SOS Details, #6 Exhibit E - Rhode Island SOS Details, #7 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Melanie Luker)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Preston O. Lee
Represented By: Stefan G. Bourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamye L. Hicks
Represented By: Lawrence E. Abernathy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?