Smith v. City of Beaumont et al
Plaintiff: David Smith
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Wayne Penton and City of Beaumont
Case Number: 2:2019cv00140
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2019 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 12/9/19. (KPM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by City of Beaumont, Wayne Penton.(Morisani, Nicholas)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Beaumont answer due 11/14/2019; Wayne Penton answer due 11/14/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 8, 2019 (KPM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by City of Beaumont, Wayne Penton (Morisani, Nicholas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of City of Beaumont, Wayne Penton (Butler, Gregory)
September 25, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : In the future when using previously filed documents, delete the header which shows the case number, document number and filing date before refiling. This will enable the new heading to be clearly visible. Please check the pdf document for errors before filing. It is not necessary to refile. (CS)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Smith re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Waide, Daniel)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Smith. Wayne Penton served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Waide, Daniel)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Smith. City of Beaumont served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Waide, Daniel)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Smith. The Court will take no action on the motion until Defendants have been served, appear, and receive a chance to respond. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/23/19. (cb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by David Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of David Smith, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of William Butler)(Waide, Daniel)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Beaumont, Wayne Penton. (CS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Beaumont, John Does 1-10, Wayne Penton (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643006432), filed by David Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City of Beaumont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Penton
Represented By: Nicholas F. Morisani
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Beaumont
Represented By: Nicholas F. Morisani
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smith
Represented By: Daniel M. Waide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?