Shields et al v. Berne et al
Plaintiff: Willie Shields and Tammy Shields
Defendant: Daniel Berne, B & B Logging, LLC and Imperium Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00152
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Timothy Ellzey on behalf of Imperium Insurance Company (Ellzey, Scott)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Imperium Insurance Company answer due 12/23/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 22, 2019. (MMc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Imperium Insurance Company (Harris, Adam)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to B & B Logging, LLC. (CS)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Willie Shields as to B & B Logging, LLC. (Abston, Willie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Shields. Daniel Berne served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Abston, Willie)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Shields. Imperium Insurance Company served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Abston, Willie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to B & B Logging, LLC, Daniel Berne, Imperium Insurance Company. (CS)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B & B Logging, LLC, Daniel Berne, Imperium Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4111813), filed by Willie Shields, Tammy Shields. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Order, #3 Exhibit B-North American Risk Letter February 14, 2019) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields et al v. Berne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Shields
Represented By: Willie T. Abston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Shields
Represented By: Willie T. Abston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Berne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & B Logging, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperium Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam B. Harris
Represented By: Scott Timothy Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?