United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Vulcan Construction Materials, LLC v. ECW Recoveries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Vulcan Construction Materials, LLC
Defendant: ECW Recoveries, LLC, The Gray Insurance Company and Michael Shae Easterling
Case Number: 2:2020cv00097
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Vulcan Construction Materials, LLC. ECW Recoveries, LLC served on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Copeland, Clyde)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Vulcan Construction Materials, LLC. Michael Shae Easterling served on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Copeland, Clyde)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. The Gray Insurance Company's answer is due on or before 8/20/20. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 10, 2020 (KPM)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by The Gray Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Taylor, Alec)
June 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Gray Insurance Company answer due 7/10/2020. (js)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. For good cause shown and there being no objection, the deadline for The Gray Insurance Company to file a responsive pleading is extended to 7/10/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 29, 2020. (js)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by The Gray Insurance Company (Taylor, Alec)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by The Gray Insurance Company (Taylor, Alec)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ECW Recoveries, LLC, Michael Shae Easterling, The Gray Insurance Company. (LDR)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ECW Recoveries, LLC, Michael Shae Easterling, The Gray Insurance Company, filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Vulcan Construction Materials, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Payment Bond, #3 Exhibit B-Credit Application, #4 Exhibit C-Invoices, #5 Exhibit D-Demand Letter) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Vulcan Construction Materials, LLC v. ECW Recoveries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECW Recoveries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gray Insurance Company
Represented By: Alec M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shae Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Vulcan Construction Materials, LLC
Represented By: Clyde X. Copeland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?