Origin Bank v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Origin Bank
Defendant: Boots Smith Pipeline Services, LLC, Jason W. Smith, Sandersville Property Holdings, LLC, Boots Smith Energy Group, Inc. and Boots Smith Oilfield Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00139
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (CS)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants, filed by Origin Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Hewitt, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Boots Smith Energy Group, Inc. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Hewitt, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Sandersville Property Holdings, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Hewitt, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Boots Smith Pipeline Services, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Hewitt, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Boots Smith Oilfield Services, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Hewitt, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Jason W. Smith served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Hewitt, Thomas)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Boots Smith Energy Group, Inc., Boots Smith Oilfield Services, LLC, Boots Smith Pipeline Services, LLC, Sandersville Property Holdings, LLC, Jason W. Smith. (LDR)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boots Smith Energy Group, Inc., Boots Smith Oilfield Services, LLC, Boots Smith Pipeline Services, LLC, Sandersville Property Holdings, LLC, Jason W. Smith ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4332441), filed by Origin Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Thirteenth Amended and Restated Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Amended, Restated, and Consolidated Term Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit C - Guaranty Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Amended and Restated Cross Guaranty Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Amended, Restated, and Consolidated Commerical Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Amended and Restated Forbearance Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Commerical Security Agreement, #8 Exhibit H - UCC Financing Statements, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Origin Bank v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boots Smith Pipeline Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandersville Property Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boots Smith Energy Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boots Smith Oilfield Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Origin Bank
Represented By: Thomas M. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?