Pumilia v. Osmose Utilities Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Pumilia
Defendant: Demarkus King and Osmose Utilities Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00152
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Demarkus King, Osmose Utilities Services, Inc. (Smith, Roy)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Demarkus King, Osmose Utilities Services, Inc. (Smith, Roy)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Charles Pumilia (Pitre, David)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Charles Pumilia (Pitre, David)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties do not consent; Jury Trial set for a two week term beginning 10/4/2021 before District Judge Keith Starrett; ETT: 3-4 days; conflicts as noted; Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2021 before District Judge Keith Starrett; Discovery due by 5/3/2021; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2020; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 11/9/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 2/1/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/1/2021; Motions due by 5/17/2021; ADR to be completed by discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 8, 2020 (KPM)
October 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/8/2020. A case management order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: David Pitre for plaintiff; Roy Smith for defendants. (KPM)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Demarkus King, Osmose Utilities Services, Inc. (Smith, Roy)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Charles Pumilia (Pitre, David)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/2/20. (KPM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Demarkus King, Osmose Utilities Services, Inc..(Smith, Roy)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy A. Smith, Jr on behalf of Demarkus King, Osmose Utilities Services, Inc. (Smith, Roy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Pumilia. Demarkus King served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Pitre, David)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Pumilia. Osmose Utilities Services, Inc. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Pitre, David)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Demarkus King, Osmose Utilities Services, Inc. (CS)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Demarkus King, Osmose Utilities Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643007046), filed by Charles Pumilia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pumilia v. Osmose Utilities Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demarkus King
Represented By: Roy A. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osmose Utilities Services, Inc.
Represented By: Roy A. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Pumilia
Represented By: David P. Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?