McDonald v. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Plaintiff: Ethel McDonald
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00094
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt addressed to Billy G. Rayner, Clerk, showing Order and docket sheet was received by Jasper County Circuit Court on 08/10/2021. (CS)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to Billy G. Rayner, Circuit Clerk of Jasper County, MS, transmitting certified copies of Order to Remand and docket sheet. (LDR)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Unopposed #5 Motion to Remand. This action is hereby remanded to the Circuit Court of the First Judicial District of Jasper County, Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 8/5/2021. (LDR)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Ethel McDonald (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cerra, Eric)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Mansfield, Kenna)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Mansfield, Kenna)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan from Circuit Court of Jasper County, Mississippi, case number 21-cv-31-P2. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-4603129) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-all process, pleadings, and orders served on FIC, #3 Exhibit B-State Court Record, #4 Exhibit C-demand ltr from pl's counsel 03.01.21) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel McDonald
Represented By: Eric N. Cerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?