Sakalarios v. SoClean, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Sakalarios
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00114
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
2 Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/27/2021. (CS)
October 27, 2021 Attorneys are advised to include the case number and new judge assignment of 2:21-cv-00114-HSO-LGI on future filed pleadings. (CS)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to Answer is now 1/11/22. If a further extension becomes necessary, the parties may file the appropriate motion with the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 10/25/21 (TS)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by SoClean, Inc. (Lambert, James)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 10/1/2021. (LDR)
October 1, 2021 Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials RHWR on future filings. (LDR)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's deadline to Answer is 11/12/21. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on September 30, 2021. (TS) Modified on 9/30/2021 (wld).
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Dyal on behalf of SoClean, Inc. (Dyal, Jonathan)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by SoClean, Inc. (Lambert, James)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Patrick Pendley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4651533) by Anthony Sakalarios (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Deakle, John)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Andrea Barient to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4651521) by Anthony Sakalarios (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Deakle, John)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrea Barient; denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Pendley. The motions are denied for failure to attach a certificate of good standing by the appropriate licensing authority according to L. U. R. Civ. 83.1(d)(4). NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/8/2021 (AB)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SoClean, Inc. (CS)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SoClean, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-4649528), filed by Anthony Sakalarios. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sakalarios v. SoClean, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sakalarios
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan P. Dyal
Represented By: James E. Lambert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?