Rivero v. BRP U.S., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Whitney Rivero
Defendant: BRP U.S., Inc. and Natchez Powersports, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00131
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Rebuttal of Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC by Natchez Powersports, LLC (Terry, Owen)
November 19, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC, filed by Whitney Rivero (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Wilson, Benjamin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC, filed by Whitney Rivero (Wilson, Benjamin)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting as unopposed Defendant BRP U.S., Inc.'s #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Remand. Defendant BRP U.S., Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's #12 Motion is now due on or before December 6, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on November 19, 2021. (ENW)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting as unopposed Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC's #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Rebuttal in support of its #9 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC's Rebuttal is now due on or before December 6, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on November 19, 2021. (ENW)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 MOTION to Remand by BRP U.S., Inc. (Carrington, Kathleen)
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply of Natchez Powersports, LLC, by Natchez Powersports, LLC (Thomas, Sam)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting as unopposed Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC's #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Remand. Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC's Response to Plaintiff's #12 Motion is now due on or before December 6, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on November 16, 2021. (ENW)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Whitney Rivero (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - PROCESS SERVER AFFIDAVIT, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - MARK EZRA AFFIDAVIT)(Wilkins, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Whitney Rivero (Wilkins, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Wilkins on behalf of Whitney Rivero (Wilkins, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER staying proceedings. The MOTION to Dismiss #9 , filed by Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC raises an issue of jurisdiction. Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 16(b)(3)(B), the attorney conference and disclosure requirements and all discovery are stayed, pending the Court's ruling on the Motion #9 . NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 11/8/21 (HM)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC, filed by Natchez Powersports, LLC (Thomas, Sam)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Natchez Powersports, LLC, by Natchez Powersports, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Thomas, Sam)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Natchez Powersports, LLC.(Thomas, Sam)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen Patrick Terry on behalf of Natchez Powersports, LLC (Terry, Owen)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sam S. Thomas on behalf of Natchez Powersports, LLC (Thomas, Sam)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 State Court Record by Defendant BRP U.S., Inc. Volumes 1 (Carrington, Kathleen)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRP U.S., Inc. (Carrington, Kathleen)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lemuel E. Montgomery, III on behalf of BRP U.S., Inc. (Montgomery, Lemuel)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by BRP U.S., Inc..(Carrington, Kathleen)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BRP U.S., Inc. from Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Mississippi, case number 21-00102PH. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-4676955) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint served on BRP, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of William Moore, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Lewis A. Watt, #5 Exhibit D - BRP US Inc. 2021 Corporate Annual Report) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivero v. BRP U.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Rivero
Represented By: Benjamin H. Wilson
Represented By: Robert F. Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen I. Carrington
Represented By: Lemuel E. Montgomery, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natchez Powersports, LLC
Represented By: Sam S. Thomas
Represented By: Owen Patrick Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?