Howard v. United States
Plaintiff: Ladreco Howard
Defendant: United States
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00147
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case. United States served on 12/29/2021, answer due 3/29/2022. Service made upon: U S Attorney. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Marshal's Return) (CS)
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case. United States served on 12/23/2021, answer due 3/23/2022. Service made upon: U S Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Marshal's Return) (CS)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States, filed by Ladreco Howard. (CS)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (CS)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Clerk is directed to prepare summonses for the Commissioner of Social Security. Clerk shall then issue process and deliver the summonses and copies of the Complaint to the USM for service on Defendant. The USM Service is ordered to serve process on Defendant and file return summonses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 11/30/2021. (CS)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H Walker on 11/30/21 (HM)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ladreco Howard. (CS)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States, filed by Ladreco Howard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Notice of Assignment) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladreco Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?