Hammers v. Sheppard et al
Plaintiff: Tracy T. Hammers
Defendant: Eldridge Sheppard, Jr., Swift Leasing Company, LLC, John Doe Person(s) 1-5, John Doe Entity(ies) 1-5 and Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00161
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Initial Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Eldridge Sheppard, Jr, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Dunbar, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Dunbar, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Eldridge Sheppard, Jr, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Dunbar, David)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2022 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 3/4/22. (KPM)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendants Eldridge Sheppard, Jr, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC Volumes 1 of 1 (Rutherford, Matthew)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Rutherford, Jr on behalf of Eldridge Sheppard, Jr, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Rutherford, Matthew)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eldridge Sheppard, Jr, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson Davis County, MS, case number 21-00136. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-4724618) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Response to Admissions, #4 Exhibit C-Agreed Order)(CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammers v. Sheppard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy T. Hammers
Represented By: John N. Rocray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldridge Sheppard, Jr.
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Matthew E. Rutherford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Leasing Company, LLC
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Person(s) 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entity(ies) 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Matthew E. Rutherford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?