Todd et al v. Quinn et al
Plaintiff: Steven Todd and Patricia Todd
Defendant: Steven Quinn, M.D., Radiology Associates, P.A. and Defendants A-Z
Case Number: 2:2023cv00051
Filed: March 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2023 Filing 15 Rebuttal re #7 MOTION for Referral to Bankruptcy Court filed by Patricia Todd, Steven Todd (Welsh, C.)
May 11, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION for Referral to Bankruptcy Court "Brief in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Refer to Case to Bankruptcy Court" filed by Steven Quinn, MD, Radiology Associates, P.A. (Heidelberg, Cecil)
May 11, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Referral to Bankruptcy Court filed by Steven Quinn, MD, Radiology Associates, P.A. (Heidelberg, Cecil)
May 8, 2023 Filing 12 Rebuttal re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, In the Alternative, to Abstain filed by Steven Quinn, MD, Radiology Associates, P.A. (Heidelberg, Cecil)
May 2, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, In the Alternative, to Abstain filed by Patricia Todd, Steven Todd (Welsh, C.)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 1, 2023 (KPM)
May 1, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Referral to Bankruptcy Court filed by Patricia Todd, Steven Todd (Welsh, C.)
May 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Trhesa B. Patterson on behalf of Steven Quinn, MD, Radiology Associates, P.A. (Patterson, Trhesa)
May 1, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Referral to Bankruptcy Court by Patricia Todd, Steven Todd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Todd's Adversary Complaint for Declaratory Relief, #2 Exhibit Bankruptcy Discharge Order Closing Case, #3 Exhibit Amended Motion to Reopen Bankruptcy Case, #4 Exhibit Bankruptcy Order Granting Motion to Reopen Case)(Welsh, C.)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, In the Alternative, to Abstain filed by Radiology Associates, P.A., Steven Quinn, M.D. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/1/2023 (lm)
April 28, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, In the Alternative, to Abstain filed by Steven Quinn, MD, Radiology Associates, P.A. (Heidelberg, Cecil)
April 28, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, In the Alternative, to Abstain by Steven Quinn, MD, Radiology Associates, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Amended Property Schedule A/B dated Nov. 22, 2016)(Heidelberg, Cecil)
April 6, 2023 Filing 3 State Court Record by Plaintiffs Patricia Todd, Steven Todd Volumes 2 (Welsh, C.)
April 6, 2023 Filing 2 State Court Record by Plaintiffs Patricia Todd, Steven Todd Volumes 1 (Welsh, C.)
March 31, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Patricia Todd, Steven Todd from Circuit Court of Jones County, Mississippi, case number 34CI2:18-cv-00049. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-5082637) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2-Motion for Summary Judgment) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd et al v. Quinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Todd
Represented By: C. Victor Welsh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Todd
Represented By: C. Victor Welsh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Quinn, M.D.
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Represented By: Trhesa B. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiology Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Represented By: Trhesa B. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?