Dunn v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Bethany Dunn
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00072
Filed: May 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties do not consent; Jury Trial set for a two week term beginning 8/5/2024 before District Judge Keith Starrett; ETT: 3 days; conflicts as noted; Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2024 before District Judge Keith Starrett; Discovery due by 3/1/2024; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2023; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 8/9/2023; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 12/1/2023; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/12/2024; Motions due by 3/15/2024; ADR Report due by 7/11/2024; ADR to be completed by discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 10, 2023 (KPM)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 7/10/2023. A case management order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: Daniel Waide for plaintiff; Calen Wills for defendant. (KPM)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Bethany Dunn (Waide, Daniel)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Bethany Dunn (Waide, Daniel)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wills, Calen)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Bethany Dunn (Waide, Daniel)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Bethany Dunn (Waide, Daniel)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2023 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 7/3/23. (KPM)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wills, Calen)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Banahan on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Banahan, John)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wills, Calen)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Circuit Court of Forrest County, Mississippi, case number 18CO1:23-cv-00451. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-5114811) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Dunn
Represented By: Daniel M. Waide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Calen J. Wills
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?