Protective Life Insurance Company v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Defendant: LaShonda Cox and Jerry W. Cox
Case Number: 2:2023cv00084
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Caroline Wynn - PHV on behalf of Protective Life Insurance Company (Wynn - PHV, Mary)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander B. Feinberg - PHV on behalf of Protective Life Insurance Company (Feinberg - PHV, Alexander)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on July 25, 2023. (ELC)
July 24, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Protective Life Insurance Company. Jerry W. Cox waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023. (Bolus, John)
July 24, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Alexander B. Feinberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5167711) by Protective Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bolus, John)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on June 28, 2023. (ELC)
June 27, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Mary Caroline Wynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-5146697) by Protective Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bolus, John)
June 13, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Protective Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Protective Life Corporation, Corporate Parent Dai-ichi Life Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Dai-ichi Life International Holdings, LLC for Protective Life Insurance Company. (Bolus, John)
June 8, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jerry W. Cox, LaShonda Cox. (CS)
June 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jerry W. Cox, LaShonda Cox (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-5131479), filed by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protective Life Insurance Company v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John N. Bolus
Represented By: Alexander B. Feinberg - PHV
Represented By: Mary Caroline Wynn - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaShonda Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?