Okorie v. Starrett
Plaintiff: Ikechukwu Hyginus Okorie
Defendant: Keith Starrett
Case Number: 2:2024cv00141
Filed: September 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation as to Doc. #8 : A Return on Summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Plaintiff is directed to refile. (CAD)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (COPY) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ikechukwu Hyginus Okorie. Keith Starrett served on 10/11/2024, answer due 11/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CAD)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (COPY) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ikechukwu Hyginus Okorie. Keith Starrett served on 10/11/2024, answer due 11/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CAD)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ikechukwu Hyginus Okorie. Keith Starrett served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CAD)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued as to Keith Starrett filed by Ikechukwu Hyginus Okorie. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAD)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation as to Doc. #5 : A return on Summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Plaintiff is directed to refile. (CAD)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Pro Se Registration for Electronic Receipt of Court Filings. (CAD)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pro Se Registration for Electronic Receipt of Court Filings. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAD)
September 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Keith Starrett. (LDR)
September 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith Starrett ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 1594), filed by Ikechukwu Hyginus Okorie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Assignment)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okorie v. Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ikechukwu Hyginus Okorie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?