Academy Health Center, Inc. et al v. Hyperion Foundation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Academy Health Center, Inc.
Defendant: Hyperion Foundation, Inc., Altacare Corporation, Long Term Care Services, Inc., Sentry Healthcare Acquirors, Inc., HP/Management Group, Inc., Julie Mittleider, Douglas K. Mittleider, John Does 1-100, John Does 1-200 and HP/Ancillaries, Inc.
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2010cv00552
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Lamar
Presiding Judge: Linda R. Anderson
Presiding Judge: Carlton W. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 243 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 247 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 08/07/2017. (NM)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER denying 216 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/31/2017. (NM)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying 66 Motion to Dismiss United States' Complaint in Intervention; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Dismiss Academy's Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim; denying 79 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint; granting 84 Motion to Strike Affidavit of Melvin Eisele. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/09/14. (jc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Academy Health Center, Inc. et al v. Hyperion Foundation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Academy Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Randall E. Day
Represented By: J. Tucker Mitchell
Represented By: Julie Bowman Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel Lynn Murray
Represented By: Edward O. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyperion Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy L. Birdsall
Represented By: James W. Boswell - PHV, III
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: Michael E. Paulhus - PHV
Represented By: Gregory C. Sicilian - PHV
Represented By: John P. Sneed
Represented By: Vikki J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altacare Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy L. Birdsall
Represented By: James W. Boswell - PHV, III
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: Michael E. Paulhus - PHV
Represented By: Gregory C. Sicilian - PHV
Represented By: John P. Sneed
Represented By: Vikki J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Term Care Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy L. Birdsall
Represented By: James W. Boswell - PHV, III
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: Michael E. Paulhus - PHV
Represented By: Gregory C. Sicilian - PHV
Represented By: John P. Sneed
Represented By: Vikki J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Healthcare Acquirors, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy L. Birdsall
Represented By: James W. Boswell - PHV, III
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: Michael E. Paulhus - PHV
Represented By: Gregory C. Sicilian - PHV
Represented By: John P. Sneed
Represented By: Vikki J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP/Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy L. Birdsall
Represented By: James W. Boswell - PHV, III
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: Michael E. Paulhus - PHV
Represented By: Gregory C. Sicilian - PHV
Represented By: John P. Sneed
Represented By: Vikki J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Mittleider
Represented By: Jeremy L. Birdsall
Represented By: James W. Boswell - PHV, III
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: Michael E. Paulhus - PHV
Represented By: Gregory C. Sicilian - PHV
Represented By: John P. Sneed
Represented By: Vikki J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas K. Mittleider
Represented By: Jeremy L. Birdsall
Represented By: James W. Boswell - PHV, III
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: Michael E. Paulhus - PHV
Represented By: Gregory C. Sicilian - PHV
Represented By: John P. Sneed
Represented By: Vikki J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP/Ancillaries, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy L. Birdsall
Represented By: James W. Boswell - PHV, III
Represented By: Michael E. Paulhus - PHV
Represented By: Gregory C. Sicilian - PHV
Represented By: John P. Sneed
Represented By: Vikki J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?