McCune v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Frank B. McCune, Jr.
Defendant: Various "John Does, Union Planters Bank, American Express Financial Services, United States Department of Justice, Office of U.S. Attorney General - Southern District of Mississippi, Merchant and Farmers Bank and Industrial Employees Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2011cv00423
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Jackson Office
County: Hinds
Presiding Judge: Tom S. Lee
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:3410
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER granting 313 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 317 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 2/5/2014 (ECW)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL dismissing, with prejudice, all claims against Defendant Merchant & Farmers Bank, with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on September 10, 2013. (lda)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 342 AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL dismissing, with prejudice, all claims against Defendant, Members Exchange Credit Union, with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on August 21, 2013.(lda)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting 302 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on July 29, 2103. (lda)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting 303 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on July 25, 2013. (lda)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion for jury trial: granted as to claims against non-governmental defendants; denied without prejudice as to advisory jury for claims against governmental defendants. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 5/21/2013 (ECW)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL dismissing, with prejudice, all claims against Defendant Regions Financial Corporation f/k/a Union Planters Bank, with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on March 27, 2013. (lda)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER finding as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 7/24/2012 (ECW)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. American Express Company is hereby dismissed from this action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on January 19, 2012. (lda)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AGREED ORDER DISMISSING INDUSTRIAL EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION. Industrial Employees Credit Union is hereby dismissed from this action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on December 12, 2011. (lda)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCune v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various "John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Planters Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of U.S. Attorney General - Southern District of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchant and Farmers Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Employees Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank B. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: Chokwe Lumumba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?