Ashley Transport, Inc. et al v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Transport, Inc. and Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC
Defendant: Paccar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., John Does (A-E), Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Peterbilt of Hattiesburg, LLC and ABC Corporations (1-5)
Case Number: 3:2011cv00469
Filed: July 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Jackson Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: John M Roper
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice as to all parties. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 3/26/13. (RRL)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #88 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Management Order. The Court finds that that this motion should be granted. The trial in this matter is continued to a three week calendar beginning November 4,2013.The pre-trial conference will be reset to October 15,2013. The discovery deadline will be extended to April 15,2013.The motion deadline will be extended to May 1,2013. A settlement conference will be held on May 13,2013 at 9:00A.M.in Jackson,Ms. Parties with full settlement authority must be physically present. Confidential memorandum must be submitted to the Court on or prior to May 2,2013.No further written order shall be issued by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Roper on March 8,2013 (Nicaud, Jenny)
March 8, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Discovery due by 4/15/2013, Motions due by 5/1/2013 ), Set/Reset Hearings:( Jury Trial set for a three week calendar beginning 11/4/2013 before District Judge Tom S. Lee, Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2013 before District Judge Tom S. Lee, Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John M. Roper in Jackson Ms. ) (Nicaud, Jenny)
March 1, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Monty Montgomery by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
March 1, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeff McKinley by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
February 27, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
February 27, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ashley Transport, Inc. by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
February 27, 2013 Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #57 Order on Motion to Continue and Amend Case Management Order by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
February 19, 2013 Filing 87 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Todd Bong by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
February 19, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Fluga by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
February 19, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Caterpillar by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
February 6, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Todd Bong by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
February 6, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Fluga by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
February 4, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
February 4, 2013 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #82 . Attorney is advised to type in the deponent's name when docketing a notice of deposition in future filings. (ND)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John M. Roper for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 2/1/13. (RRL)
January 24, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
January 24, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
January 24, 2013 Filing 78 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ashley Transport, Inc. by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
January 17, 2013 Filing 77 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Monty Montgomery, Montgomery & Bivins, CPA. (Schelver, Stephen)
January 16, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Montgomery & Bivins, CPA by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Produce Documents in Civil Action)(Schelver, Stephen)
December 19, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Response to Request for Production by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
December 19, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Response to Interrogatories by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 Filing 73 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Central MS Truck Repair and Body Shop, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Central MS Truck Repair and Body Shop, Inc., by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Produce Documents in Civil Action)(Schelver, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Designation of Experts by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
November 30, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Responses (see Order at Dkt. 63), Response to Request for Production by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
November 30, 2012 Filing 69 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Responses (see Order at Dkt. 63), Response to Interrogatories by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #67 Motion to Extend Expert Designation Deadlines. Plaintiffs' expert designation deadline is extendced to 12/18/12; defendants' expert designation deadline is extended to 1/24/13. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 30, 2012 (KPM)
November 29, 2012 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion re #67 MOTION to Extend Plaintiff's Designation of Experts Deadline filed by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
November 29, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION to Extend Plaintiff's Designation of Experts Deadline by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Response to Order re #63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #56 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 31, 2012. (KM) filed by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 9/11/12 Email Correspondence with Good Faith Certificate)(Schelver, Stephen)
November 8, 2012 Filing 65 Third NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
November 8, 2012 Filing 64 Second NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #56 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 31, 2012. (KM)
October 18, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Designation of Experts by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
October 8, 2012 Filing 61 Rebuttal re #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery, #60 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
October 1, 2012 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
September 25, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Response to Request for Production by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #58 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Defendants are granted an extension through 10/1/2012 to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 24, 2012. (KM)
September 21, 2012 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Continue and Amending Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 11, 2012. (KM)
September 11, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2012 re #54 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Term and Reset Deadlines filed by Ashley Transport, Inc., Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC. An amended case management order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: Ken Adcock for plaintiffs; Stephen Schelver and Deirdre McGlinchey for defendants. (KPM)
September 11, 2012 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings: Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 12/4/2012; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/10/2013; Discovery due by 3/1/2013; Motions due by 3/15/2013; Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2013 before District Judge Tom S. Lee; Jury Trial set for three-week term beginning 8/5/2013 before District Judge Tom S. Lee. (KM)
September 10, 2012 Set Deadlines as to #54 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Term and Reset Deadlines. Having confirmed the availability of counsel, a TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing is set for 9/11/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel for the Caterpillar defendants has provided a call-in number for the conference and all parties shall call in at the appropriate time. (KPM)
September 5, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pls 1st Set of RPD to Cat, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Cat's Resp to Pls 1st RPD, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Order Compelling Discovery, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Stipulation and Protective Order, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Letter dated August 8, 2012 to McGlinchey, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Cat's Designation of Experts)(Adcock, Ken)
September 4, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
August 28, 2012 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Term and Reset Deadlines by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
August 23, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE of Service of Second Set of Request for Production by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
August 23, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
August 23, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ashley Transport, Inc. by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting #47 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 20, 2012 (KPM)
July 20, 2012 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings: Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/3/2012; Discovery due by 10/4/2012; Motions due by 10/18/2012 (KPM)
July 13, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
July 13, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ashley Transport, Inc. by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
July 10, 2012 Filing 47 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #25 Case Management Order,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
June 7, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
June 7, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC (Adcock, Ken)
June 1, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
May 8, 2012 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant PACCAR Inc by Paccar, Inc. (Hooper, Sanford)
April 26, 2012 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #25 Case Management Order,, by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #42 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Management Order. Plaintiffs' expert designation deadline is extended to 6/1/12; Defendants' expert designation deadline is extended to 8/1/12. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 26, 2012 (KPM)
April 3, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss by Paccar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Hooper, Sanford)
March 28, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE of Service of Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC Response to Interrogatories by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC (Adcock, Ken)
March 28, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Service of Ashley Transport, Inc. Response to Interrogatories by Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #37 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 9, 2012 (KPM)
February 8, 2012 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
February 7, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
February 7, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
January 3, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
January 3, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
November 14, 2011 Filing 32 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Peterbilt of Hattiesburg, LLC. (Adcock, Ken)
November 3, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Request for Production by Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
October 28, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order to Confer on Electronically Stored Information (Joint Report) by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. re #25 Case Management Order,, (Schelver, Stephen)
October 13, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
October 13, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
October 13, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
October 13, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
October 13, 2011 NOTICE: Counsel for PACCAR, Inc., Sanford Hooper, has advised the court that he has a conflict with the trial setting as he has a trial previously set in King County Superior Court in Washington state on 2/11/13. Pursuant to U.L.Civ.R 16(k), this previously set conflict will be honored in the event both cases proceed to trial. (KPM)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties do not consent; Plaintiff's pre-discovery Disclosures due by 10/10/2011; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2011; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 11/2/2011; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 5/1/2012; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 7/1/2012; Motions due by 9/18/2012; Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2013 before District Judge Tom S. Lee; Jury Trial set for a two week term beginning 2/4/2013 before District Judge Tom S. Lee; no conflicts; settlement conference or private mediation to be completed by discovery deadline; the parties are to confer and report regarding ESI issues as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 5, 2011 (KPM)
October 5, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
October 3, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/3/2011. A case management order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: Ken Adcock for plaintiffs; Stephen Schelver and Deirdre McGlinchey for Caterpillar defendants; Sandy Hooper for Paccar. (KPM)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXTONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Deirdre C. McGlinchey is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 3, 2011 (KPM)
September 30, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Peterbilt of Hattiesburg. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 9/30/11 (LWE)
September 28, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for Deirdre C. McGlinchey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LA USDC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - LA Supreme Court Certificate)(Schelver, Stephen)
September 28, 2011 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Deirdre C. McGlinchey receipt number 0538-1964878 $ 100 (Schelver, Stephen)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Colvin G. Norwood is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 22, 2011 (KPM)
September 21, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for Colvin G. Norwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Colvin Norwood's Certificate of Good Standing with Supreme Court of LA, #2 Exhibit 2 - Colvin Norwood's Certificate of Good Standing with United States District Court of LA, #3 Exhibit 3 - Colvin Norwood's Certificate of Good Standing with Supreme Court of Texas)(Schelver, Stephen)
September 21, 2011 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Colvin G. Norwood receipt number 0538-1959230 $ 100 (Schelver, Stephen)
September 19, 2011 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Peterbilt of Hattiesburg, LLC (Hooper, Sanford)
September 15, 2011 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
September 15, 2011 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
September 15, 2011 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
September 7, 2011 Filing 15 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2011 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel for plaintiff is responsible for initiating the conference call and shall contact Judge Parker's chambers (601.544.9100) when all parties are connected. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/28/11. (KPM)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 9/1/11 (LWE)
August 22, 2011 Filing 13 Joinder in Document by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. to #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Paccar, Inc., #11 Response to Motion filed by Paccar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
August 19, 2011 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 Response to Motion filed by Paccar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jack Brabham)(Hooper, Sanford)
August 19, 2011 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Paccar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jack Brabham)(Hooper, Sanford)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE pending ruling on motion to remand #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on August 9, 2011 (KPM)
August 8, 2011 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peterbilt of Hattiesburg, LLC (Hooper, Sanford)
August 8, 2011 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Peterbilt of Hattiesburg, LLC (Hooper, Sanford)
August 8, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Peterbilt of Hattiesburg, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ron Johnson, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Mitch Dorr)(Hooper, Sanford)
August 5, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC, Ashley Transport, Inc. (Adcock, Ken)
August 5, 2011 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paccar, Inc. (Hooper, Sanford)
August 4, 2011 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc..(Schelver, Stephen)
August 4, 2011 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Caterpillar, Inc..(Schelver, Stephen)
July 28, 2011 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), filed by Paccar, Inc.. (ND)
July 28, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paccar, Inc. from Circuit Court of Smith County, Ms, case number 2011-192. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 34643011013) Pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lower Court Pleadings served on Paccar, #2 Exhibit B - Entire State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Lower Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Lower Court Pleadings served on CES, #5 Exhibit E - Lower Court Pleadings served on Peterbilt, #6 Exhibit F - Lower Court Pleadings served on Caterpillar, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Ron Johnson, #8 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Mitch Dorr, #9 Exhibit I - Consent to Removal, #10 Exhibit J - Consent to Removal, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley Transport, Inc. et al v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Represented By: Sanford G. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Schelver
Represented By: Colvin G. Norwood - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Deirdre C. McGlinchey - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (A-E)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Schelver
Represented By: Colvin G. Norwood - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: Deirdre C. McGlinchey - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt of Hattiesburg, LLC
Represented By: Sanford G. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations (1-5)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Coursey Tullos
Represented By: Ken R. Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Farms & Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Eugene Coursey Tullos
Represented By: Ken R. Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?