Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00895
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 CONSENT DECREE Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/12/2017 (dtj)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying 138 Motion in Limine; granting 139 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 140 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion in Limine Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/18/2017 (dtj)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER. Responses to Motions 138 , 139 , 140 and 141 are due seven days prior to the pretrial conference. Responses due January 12, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/6/2017 (dtj)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 105 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 116 Motion to Strike. A separate Judgment will be entered herein. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/27/2015 (scp)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 69 Motion to Compel and denying 80 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 22, 2015. (js)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Defendant Community Health Systems, Inc.'s 12 Motion to Dismiss; and finding as moot Defendant Community Health Systems, Inc.'s 14 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on September 22, 2014 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Julie Steptoe Bean
Represented By: Harriett F. Johnson
Represented By: James L. Lee
Represented By: Steven Lee Murray
Represented By: Gwendolyn Young Reams
Represented By: C. Emanuel Smith
Represented By: Maneesh Varma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: Anna C. Sweat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?