Hale v. Abangan et al
Plaintiff: John Ashley Hale
Defendant: Roland Abangan, John Doe, Unknown Chaney, Unknown Radcliff and John & Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2015cv00170
Filed: March 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Lauderdale
Presiding Judge: F. Keith Ball
Presiding Judge: Carlton W. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER adopting 250 Report and Recommendation; granting 180 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 182 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 183 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 193 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 203 Motion to serve defendant; finding as moot 207 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 213 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 216 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 223 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 2/23/2018. Copy mailed to plaintiff at address listed on docket sheet. (AC)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER adopting 202 Report and Recommendation; denying 134 Motion to Dismiss; denying 135 Motion to Dismiss; granting 137 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/6/2017. Copy mailed to plaintiff at address listed on docket sheet. (AC)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER adopting 168 Report and Recommendation; denying 99 Motion to Dismiss; denying 101 Motion to Dismiss; denying 103 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 2/28/2017. Copy mailed to plaintiff at address listed on docket sheet. (AC)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Dismiss; adopting in part 121 Report and Recommendation; granting 129 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/30/2016. Copy mailed to plaintiff at address listed on docket sheet. (AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. Abangan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ashley Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Abangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?