Stallworth v. Bryant et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery A. Stallworth
Defendant: Dewey Phillip "Phil&quot Bryant, State of Mississippi, Mississippi Legislature, East Metro Parkway and Mississippi Department of Transportation
Case Number: 3:2016cv00246
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Hinds
Presiding Judge: F. Keith Ball
Presiding Judge: Carlton W. Reeves
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER denying 255 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 261 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/20/18 (RBM)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER overruling 252 Objection to 251 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion to Enforce Subpoenas. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 6/25/2018. (AC)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting 275 Motion for Stay of Order 251 . Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/12/18 (RBM)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 214 Motion to Enforce Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/19/17 (RBM)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting in part 79 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 7/25/2017. (AC)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting 210 Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. New deadlines to be set by the Court after consideration of Motions 214 and 222 . Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/11/17 (RBM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER denying 77 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 7/6/2017. (AC)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; finding as moot 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 14 Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 8/18/2016. (AC)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Intervene; finding as moot 15 Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 7/19/2016. Copy emailed to plaintiff. (AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallworth v. Bryant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery A. Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey Phillip "Phil&quot Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Legislature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Metro Parkway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?