Cascade Capital Group, LLC v. Livingston Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cascade Capital Group, LLC
Defendant: Livingston Holdings, LLC, Chestnut Developers, LLC, David Landrum and Michael L. Sharpe
Case Number: 3:2017cv00952
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion for Attorney Fees Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 05/21/2020 (Guirola, Louis)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying 154 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 154 Motion for New Trial Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 04/08/2020 (Guirola, Louis)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 03/06/2020 (Guirola, Louis)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 76 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/04/2019 (Guirola, Louis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascade Capital Group, LLC v. Livingston Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascade Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Tiffany Piazza Grove
Represented By: Patrick F. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livingston Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Steven H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chestnut Developers, LLC
Represented By: Steven H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Landrum
Represented By: Harris H. Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Sharpe
Represented By: John G. Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?