The Mississippi Bar v. Ross
Plaintiff: The Mississippi Bar
Respondent: Matthew Ross
Interested Party: Katherine Alexander, Sandra E Campbell and Arthur Johnston
Case Number: 3:2018ad00005
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF SUSPENSION as to Matthew D. Ross. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 01/14/2019. (KHA)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Refused), "RTS" as to #2 Order to Show Cause. (KHA)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, "Return to Sender, Vacant, Unable to Forward" as to #2 Order to Show Cause. (KHA)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Matthew D. Ross. Show Cause Response due by 1/14/2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 12/12/2018. (KHA)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 DEFAULT JUDGMENT as to the Suspension of Matthew D. Ross by the Supreme Court of Mississippi, dated December 10, 2018, Cause No. 2016-B-1420 and filed by same. (Attachments: #(1) Cover Letter). (KHA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Mississippi Bar v. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Katherine Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sandra E Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Arthur Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Mississippi Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?