Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Chakakhan R. Davis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2018cv00462
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Hinds
Presiding Judge: William H Barbour
Referring Judge: John C Gargiulo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order (Davis v. Wal-Mart), #2 Exhibit 2 - Judgment (16-60204))(Eldridge-Federal Gov, Cynthia)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Lynn Eldridge-Federal Gov on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Eldridge-Federal Gov, Cynthia)
August 31, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Chakakhan R. Davis. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 8/24/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Service made upon: U S Attorney. (ND)
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Written Objections unto the undersigned Magistrates Judge presiding over this matter for review, filed by Chakakhan R. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(ND)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE: Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Chakakhan R. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General in re Order #10 . (ND)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF SUMMONSES AND SERVICE BY THE MARSHALS SERVICE - Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/21/2018 (ND)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER requiring answer and briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/17/2018 (AG)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/17/2018 (AG)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by District Judge William H. Barbour, Jr on 8/16/18 (Lewis, Nijah)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Chakakhan R. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support, #2 Envelope)(ND)
July 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Judge, filed by Chakakhan R. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must complete Form AO 239, which is an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/17/2018 (AG)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE: Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Chakakhan R. Davis. (VM)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chakakhan R. Davis (VM)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Chakakhan R. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Exhibit B - Application Summary, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Decision, #4 Exhibit D - Jan 3 2018 Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cynthia Lynn Eldridge-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chakakhan R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?