Amerson v. Sollie et al
Plaintiff: Lee Tommie Amerson
Defendant: Sheriff Billy Sollie, Officer Aurion Leverett, Major Mellisa McCarter and John Doe
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2018cv00468
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Lauderdale
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Clerk shall edit Defendant Medical Dept. to John Doe, Medical Dept. On or before October 3, 2018, Plaintiff must file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 9/10/2018. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aurion Leverett, Mellisa McCarter, Billy Sollie and Medical Dept., filed by Lee Tommie Amerson in re Order #7 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, on or before September 14, 2018, Plaintiff is required to file an amendedcomplaint on the complaint form attached to this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/17/18. [Copy of Order and Complaint form mailed to plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Complaint Form)(LDR)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/17/18. [Copy mailed to plaintiff, Lauderdale County Detention Facility] (LDR)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138, filed by Lee Tommie Amerson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/24/18. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - That petitioner's petition #1 is construed as a conditions of confinement complaint filed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. That the Clerk is directed to edit the docket to reflect that this civil action is filed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 7/23/2018 (ND)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lee Tommie Amerson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kw)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lee Tommie Amerson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) Copy of NEF and Notice of Assignment mailed to Amerson.(kw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amerson v. Sollie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Tommie Amerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Billy Sollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Aurion Leverett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Mellisa McCarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?