Hawk Technology Systems, LLC v. Canton Public School District
Plaintiff: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Defendant: Canton Public School District
Case Number: 3:2018cv00512
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. Canton Public School District served on 8/4/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Dantone, Frank)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hawk Technology Systems, LLC for Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Dantone, Frank)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAILING of AO 120 Patent Form to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office in re #1 Complaint. (ND)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Canton Public School District. (ND)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Canton Public School District ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-3772980), filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claim Chart, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC v. Canton Public School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canton Public School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Represented By: Frank John Dantone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?