Uzzle v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr.
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00517
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production, Requests for Admission and Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Henson, Finisse)
September 28, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Interrogatories and Response to Request for Production by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Henson, Finisse)
September 17, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr (Kittell, Christopher)
September 14, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pickett, Kaytie)
September 14, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pickett, Kaytie)
September 14, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pickett, Kaytie)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 9/20/2018 Jury Trial set during a two-week trial calendar beginning on 9/3/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Henry T. Wingate Discovery due by 3/20/2019 Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2018 Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 10/8/2018 Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 12/21/2018 Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/21/2019 Motions due by 4/3/2019 Settlement Conference set for 3/20/2019 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson ADR Report due by 8/2/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/6/2018 (WG)
September 6, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/6/2018. Participants: Christopher Kittell, Matthew Williams, Finisse Henson III, William Rooks and Kaytie Pickett. Case Management Order to be entered. (WG)
September 4, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pickett, Kaytie)
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (Williams, Matthew)
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr (Kittell, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Henson, Finisse)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of WILLIAM H. ROOKS as co-counsel for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/23/2018. No further written order will issue. (WG)
August 22, 2018 Filing 15 ATTACHMENT re #14 MOTION for William H. Rooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3790155) State Bar of Georgia Good Standing by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Henson, Finisse)
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for William H. Rooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3790155) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Henson, Finisse)
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr (Kittell, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr (Kittell, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr (Kittell, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr (Kittell, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr (Kittell, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr (Kittell, Christopher)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation.(Williams, Matthew)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Pickett, Kaytie)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Henson, Finisse)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Henson, Finisse)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2018 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson (WG)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pickett, Kaytie)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equifax Information Services, LLC from Circuit Court of Warren County, Mississippi, case number 18-cv-00060-CI. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3775544) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uzzle v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keith Uzzle, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher E. Kittell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Represented By: Matthew M. Williams
Represented By: Doris Theresa Bobadilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Finisse Ewin Henson, III
Represented By: William Henry Rooks - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Kaytie M. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?