Wright v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Wright
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc., American Airlines Group, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv00661
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Emily A. Westermeier be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/13/2018. (JEJ)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Emily A. Westermeier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3853446) by Antonio Wright (Attachments: #1 Supplement Louisiana Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supplement Illinois Certificate of Good Standing)(Hammack, Jacqueline)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Airlines Group, Inc., American Airlines, Inc. (Graham, Dudley)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Airlines Group, Inc., American Airlines, Inc..(Graham, Dudley)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dudley Collier Graham, Jr on behalf of American Airlines Group, Inc., American Airlines, Inc. (Graham, Dudley)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Airlines Group, Inc., American Airlines, Inc. Summons forwarded to Jacqueline K. Hammack,THE BIZER LAW FIRM, LLC, 3319 St. Claude Ave., New Orleans, LA 70117. (LAT)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Airlines Group, Inc., American Airlines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3815400), filed by Antonio Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Wright
Represented By: Jacqueline K. Hammack
Represented By: Emily A. Westermeier - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc.
Represented By: Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?