Wheeler v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Feleasha Wheeler
Defendant: Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC, Synchrony Bank, Trans Union, LLC, United Consumer Financial Services Company, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Onemain Financial, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00684
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Trans Union, LLC answer due 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/30/2018. No further written order shall issue. (WG)
November 29, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #37 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (KNS)
November 29, 2018 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Consumer Financial Services Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Scott Fetzer Financial Group, Other Affiliate BHSF, Inc. for United Consumer Financial Services Company. (Dixon - PHV, Todd)
November 29, 2018 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support re #37 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant United Consumer Financial Services Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by United Consumer Financial Services Company (Dixon - PHV, Todd)
November 29, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant United Consumer Financial Services Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) by United Consumer Financial Services Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dixon - PHV, Todd)
November 29, 2018 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC (Driskell, Mitchell)
November 27, 2018 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC (Willson, Walter)
November 20, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Vanderver on behalf of Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC (Vanderver, Clint)
November 20, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC.(Willson, Walter)
November 20, 2018 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Onemain Financial, LLC identifying Corporate Parent OneMain Holdings, Inc. for Onemain Financial, LLC. (Tyson, Mark)
November 16, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Onemain Financial, LLC.(Tyson, Mark)
November 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Trans Union, LLC answer due 11/30/2018. (WG)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #30 Motion to Extend Deadline to respond to complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/14/2018. No further written order will issue. (WG)
November 14, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Extend November 16, 2018 Response to Plaintiff's Complaint Deadline by Trans Union, LLC (Driskell, Mitchell)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of TODD A. DIXON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/14/2018. No further written order will issue. (WG)
November 13, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark H. Tyson on behalf of Onemain Financial, LLC (Tyson, Mark)
November 13, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Todd A. Dixon to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Receipt # 34643052609, paid $100 PHV fee), filed by United Consumer Financial Services Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(ND)
November 13, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Synchrony Bank (Comley, Hugh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Synchrony Bank.(Comley, Hugh)
November 5, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell O. Driskell, III on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Driskell, Mitchell)
November 1, 2018 Filing 24 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson (WG)
October 30, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackie R. Bost, II on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Bost, Jackie)
October 30, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Pickett, Kaytie)
October 30, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Pickett, Kaytie)
October 30, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/30/2018 (KNS).
October 30, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #18 : Summons Returned Incomplete as to Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC. When the Rules allow for service of process by certified mail, the return showing proof of such service must be accompanied by the green card showing the Defendant's receipt of the summons and complaint. Filer is directed to refile and attach said green cards along with Proof of Service to show that defendant(s) were actually served. (KNS)
October 30, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Trans Union, LLC served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U. S. Postal return receipt)(Trewolla, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/30/2018 (KNS).
October 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: United Consumer Financial Services Company answer due 11/29/2018. (WG)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 11/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/30/2018. No further written order will issue. (WG)
October 29, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by United Consumer Financial Services Company (Miller, Julian)
October 29, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian D. Miller on behalf of United Consumer Financial Services Company (Miller, Julian)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Reissued as to Trans Union, LLC. (KNS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Onemain Financial, LLC served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U. S. Postal return receipt)(Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. United Consumer Financial Services Company served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U. S. Postal return receipt)(Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U. S. Postal return receipt)(Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Synchrony Bank served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U. S. Postal return receipt)(Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U. S. Postal return receipt)(Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Feleasha Wheeler as to Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Tracking Unable to Deliver)(Trewolla, David)
October 22, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , and #8 : Proof of Service of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attachment of a U. S. Postal return receipt only [or other attachment] is not sufficient without completed proof. Attorney is directed to refile using AO form 440 and may attach green cards as an exhibit with a description. (KNS)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 ***ERROR***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. United Consumer Financial Services Company served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 ***ERROR***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Onemain Financial, LLC served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 ***ERROR***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 ***ERROR***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Synchrony Bank served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 ***ERROR***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Feleasha Wheeler. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 ***ERROR***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***Summons Returned Unexecuted by Feleasha Wheeler as to Trans Union, LLC. (Trewolla, David) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KNS).
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Onemain Financial, LLC, Synchrony Bank, Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, United Consumer Financial Services Company. (KNS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Onemain Financial, LLC, Synchrony Bank, Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, United Consumer Financial Services Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3823528), filed by Feleasha Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Loan of Mississippi, LLC
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Represented By: Clint D. Vanderver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Hugh Ruston Comley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell O. Driskell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Consumer Financial Services Company
Represented By: Todd A. Dixon - PHV
Represented By: Julian D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Kaytie M. Pickett
Represented By: Jackie R. Bost, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onemain Financial, LLC
Represented By: Mark H. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feleasha Wheeler
Represented By: David Luke Trewolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?