Biancea Anderson v. South Sunflower County Hospital, et al
Plaintiff: Biancea Anderson
Defendant: South Sunflower County Hospital, Phil Bryant and James M. Hood
Case Number: 3:2018cv00692
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Biancea Anderson (Turnage, Ellis)
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Biancea Anderson (Turnage, Ellis)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by South Sunflower County Hospital.(Malatesta, Jacob)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by South Sunflower County Hospital (Malatesta, Jacob)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by South Sunflower County Hospital (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer, #4 Exhibit 4 - Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 5 - Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6 - Stipulation of Dismissal, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2nd Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summons, #9 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit, #10 Exhibit 10 - MTD w-Memo, #11 Exhibit 11 - Response w-Memo, #12 Exhibit 12 - Memo Opinion and Order)(Malatesta, Jacob)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting for good cause shown unopposed #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. South Sunflower County Hospital answer due 12/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/27/2018. No further written order will issue. (WG)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by South Sunflower County Hospital (Malatesta, Jacob)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/26/2018. (WG)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Phil Bryant, James M. Hood (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Phil Bryant, James M. Hood (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov on behalf of Phil Bryant, James M. Hood (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biancea Anderson. Phil Bryant served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Turnage, Ellis)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biancea Anderson. James M. Hood served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Turnage, Ellis)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biancea Anderson. South Sunflower County Hospital served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Turnage, Ellis)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Phil Bryant, James M. Hood, and South Sunflower County Hospital. (ND)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phil Bryant, James M. Hood, South Sunflower County Hospital ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3827659), filed by Biancea Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Report on Hospitals, #2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Dr. Howard T. Katz, #3 Exhibit 3 - Life Care Plan by Occupational Consulting, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biancea Anderson v. South Sunflower County Hospital, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Sunflower County Hospital
Represented By: Jacob O. Malatesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Bryant
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Hood
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biancea Anderson
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?