John W. Jamison III Irrevocable Trust Dated April 1, 1999

Interested Party: U.S. Trustee, U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson and Creditor Committee
Appellant: John W. Jamison III Irrevocable Trust Dated April 1, 1999
In Re: Pioneer Health Services, Inc. et al.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00716
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: F Keith Ball
1 Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Letters sent to David B. Anderson, Ryan K. Cochran, Sean C. Kulka and Darryl Scott Laddin on December 23, 2018, requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PKM)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED* DOCUMENT #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by John W. Jamison III Irrevocable Trust Dated April 1, 1999 (Attachments: #1 Appeal Record)(PKM)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Appeal Record, #2 Appeal Record, #3 Appeal Record, #4 Appeal Record, #5 Appeal Record, #6 Appeal Record, #7 Appeal Record, #8 Appeal Record, #9 Appeal Record, #10 Appeal Record, #11 Appeal Record, #12 Appeal Record, #13 Appeal Record, #14 Appeal Record, #15 Clerk's Certificate, #16 Transmittal Letter)(PKM)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-01119-NPO. File received The docketing of the record on appeal by USDC starts the briefing schedule. Attorneys should refer to Bankruptcy Rule 8018 for all briefing schedules., filed by John W. Jamison III Irrevocable Trust Dated April 1, 1999. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Clerk's Notice of Appeal, #2 Supplement Docket Sheet, #3 Cover Letter)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John W. Jamison III Irrevocable Trust Dated April 1, 1999
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Ronald H. McAlpin-Federal Gov
Represented By: Christopher J. Steiskal, Sr.
Represented By: Margaret O. Middleton-Federal Gov
Represented By: Christopher James Steiskal-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Creditor Committee
Represented By: James A. McCullough, II
Represented By: Sean C. Kulka - PHV-Transfer BK
Represented By: Darryl Scott Laddin - PHV-Transfer BK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John W. Jamison III Irrevocable Trust Dated April 1, 1999
Represented By: David B. Anderson - PHV-Transfer Bk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Pioneer Health Services, Inc. et al.
Represented By: Heath A. Fite
Represented By: Jarret P. Nichols
Represented By: Ryan K. Cochran - PHV-Transfer BK
Represented By: Craig M. Geno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?