Crain v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Angela Crain
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2018cv00787
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: **ERROR** Disregard Docket Annotation as to Doc. 9 (VM)
December 20, 2018 **ERROR** DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to 9 : Incorrect document attached. Attorney is directed to refile and attach the correct pdf document. (VM) Modified on 12/20/2018 (VM).
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (VM)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/20/2018 (WG)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/19/18 (CCO)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Angela Crain (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(VM)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Angela Crain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crain v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Crain
Represented By: Ricky Brian Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?