Creath v. Tatum Development Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Al Creath
Defendant: Tatum Development Corporation, John Does 1-5 and The Merchants Company d/b/a Merchants Foodservice
Case Number: 3:2018cv00832
Filed: December 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Merchants Company d/b/a Merchants Foodservice.(Sims, Jennifer)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Party. The Merchants Company d/b/a Merchants Foodservice added. Tatum Development Corporation (d/b/a The Merchants Company d/b/a Merchants Foodservice) terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/28/19 (RBM)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant by Tatum Development Corporation (Sims, Jennifer)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Suzanne Griggins Keys terminated. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/15/19 (RBM)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Suzanne Keys (Keys, Suzanne)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael R. Green on behalf of Al Creath (Green, Rafael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tatum Development Corporation. (cwl)
December 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-5 and Tatum Development Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-3867043), filed by Al Creath. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creath v. Tatum Development Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatum Development Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer D. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Merchants Company d/b/a Merchants Foodservice
Represented By: Jennifer D. Sims
Represented By: Martin J. Regimbal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Creath
Represented By: Catouche J. L. Body
Represented By: Suzanne Griggins Keys
Represented By: Rafael R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?