Oakley v. War Fighting System Solutions Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ryan Oakley
Defendant: Lisette Wyno-Brough and War Fighting System Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00837
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
January 25, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6. This Order failed to include a time for the hearing. See the corrected Order below [Docket #7]. (Lewis, Nijah)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by War Fighting System Solutions Inc., Lisette Wyno-Brough.(Herring, C.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Oakley. Lisette Wyno-Brough served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Watson, Louis)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Ryan Oakley (Norris, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to War Fighting System Solutions Inc. and Lisette Wyno-Brough. (VM)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against War Fighting System Solutions Inc. and Lisette Wyno-Brough (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3867757), filed by Ryan Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley v. War Fighting System Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Oakley
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Nicholas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisette Wyno-Brough
Represented By: C. Paige Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: War Fighting System Solutions Inc.
Represented By: C. Paige Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?